+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Rules suspended.
- Amendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- ORDERED ENGROSSED
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Returned to the House as concurred in as amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Davis
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Vaught
+ − Vote
April 3, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (136)
Type:
Primary Sponsor