+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor