+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Resolution received unanimous support.
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor