+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2012: Resolution read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2012: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8