+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- Notice of Reconsideration given.
- Notice of Reconsideration withdrawn
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Wardlaw
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: Resolution read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2019: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor