+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Motion to suspend the rules to place HJR 1016 on the calendar PASSED.
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2017: Resolution read and concurred in.
March 1, 2017: Motion to suspend the rules to place HJR 1016 on the calendar PASSED.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
February 23, 2017: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor