+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and failed to pass.
- The vote by which HJR 1003 FAILED was EXPUNGED.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Williams
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Ballinger
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Ballinger
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2017: Read third time and failed to pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
March 27, 2017: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 11