+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Barnett
Amendment H4
Sponsored by Barnett
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Barnett
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Barnett
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Resolution read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2011: Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor