+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Rules suspended.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor