+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transfer To The Committee On House Management
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor