+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution read and concurred in.
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Leding
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor