+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by V. Flowers
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor