+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB2233 is now Act 1093
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Ballinger
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor