+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by H. Wilkins
+ − Vote
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor