+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2204 is now Act 1120
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- EXPUNGED
- Read third time and failed to pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2013: Read third time and failed to pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 9
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor