+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB2202 is now Act 1200
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transfer to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Senators J. Key, G. Baker, J. Dismang, Elliott, S.
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor