+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB2198 is now Act 1199
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by T. Steele
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Laverty
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2011: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 13
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 21, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor