+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2197 is now Act 1359
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor