+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by G. Smith
Amendment H1
Sponsored by G. Smith
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor