+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
- EXPUNGED
- The vote by which HB2173 Failed to Pass was expunged.
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Altes
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 16
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 15
March 28, 2011: The vote by which HB2173 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor