+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment H2
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Files
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor