+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB2138 is now Act 1014
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by V. Flowers
Amendment H1
Sponsored by V. Flowers
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 19