+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2087 is now Act 1008
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Clause fails of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 25
March 22, 2013: Emergency Clause fails of adoption.
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 28
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor