+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2084 is now Act 1059
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor