+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB2048 is now Act 706
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lindsey
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 15, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor