+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB2039 is now Act 965
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor