+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Died in the House at Sine Die
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Sabin
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Sabin
+ − Vote
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor