+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2019 is now Act 1221
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Received from the House.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor