+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 26
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor