+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as requested.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as requested.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Perry
+ − Vote
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 29
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor