+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1973 is now Act 1114
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Douglas
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor