+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1939 is now Act 963
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Wallace
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
March 18, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor