+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by D. Douglas
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Douglas
+ − Vote
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor