+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1934 is now Act 1102
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Motion to remove bill from committee and place on supplemental calendar passed
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 T. Garner 4/26/2021 11:07:28 AM PDF
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2021: Motion to remove bill from committee and place on supplemental calendar passed
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 18
April 27, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 19
April 27, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 17