+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1928 is now Act 1028
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- The vote by which HB1928 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote
- Read the third time and failed.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by V. Flowers
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 13
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 19
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor