+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Johnston
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Johnston
+ − Vote
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor