+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1914 is now Act 832
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Tyler
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5