+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1913 is now Act 992
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor