+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1905 is now Act 891
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Woods
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Woods
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
March 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor