+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1901 is now Act 1480
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 2.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Amendment # 1 AND 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2.
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
April 17, 2013: Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor