+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1897 is now Act 984
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Baltz
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Baltz
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor