+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1896 is now Act 1479
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Clemmer
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Clemmer
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Clemmer
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 17, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor