+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1895 is now Act 910
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Powers
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hutchinson
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor