+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1894 is now Act 920
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor