+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1892 is now Act 730
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor