+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1887 is now Act 799
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- The vote by which HB1887 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 43
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor