+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1880 is now Act 989
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 C. Tucker 4/15/2021 10:35:58 AM PDF
Sponsored by C. Tucker
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 14, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor