+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Died in House at Sine Die
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Member's withdrawal of own Bill - HB1866 was objected to
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- The vote by which HB 1866 PASSED was EXPUNGED.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 7
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor