+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Perry
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Perry
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor