+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 18